Showing posts with label maths. Show all posts
Showing posts with label maths. Show all posts

## Monday, November 16, 2020

• November 16, 2020
• • , ,
• 1 comment

## Multiplication of numbers with a series of 9's,Facts,Quiz,more Maths topics

Multiplication of numbers with a series of 9's

Hi friends and my dear students! In this post, I have covered  Multiplication of numbers with a series of 9's  After Reading  Please do share it with your friends. Learn maths for All classes here

Multiplication of numbers with a series of 9's

In my seminars , I often have an audience challenge round . In this round , the audience members ask me to perform various mental calculations and give them the correct answer . They generally ask me to multiply numbers which involve a lot of 9's in them . The general perception is that the higher the number of 9's the tougher it will be for me to calculate . However , the truth is exactly the opposite - the higher the number of 9's in the question , the easier it is for me to calculate the correct answer . I use two methods for this . The first method is given below and the second method is explained in the chapter ' Base Method of Multiplication ' .

Using the method given below , we can multiply any given number with a series of nines . In other words , we can instantly multiply any number with 99 , 999,9999 , 99999 , etc.

The technique is divided into three cases . In the first case , we will be multiplying a given number with an equal number of nines . In the second case we will be multiplying a number with a higher number of nines . In the third case , we will be multiplying a number with a lower number of nines ,

Case 1 ( Multiplying a number with an equal number of nines )

( Q ) Multiply 654 by 999

• 654

x 999

-------

=653 346

• We subtract 1 from 654 and write half the answer as 653 . Answer at this stage is 653 . .

• Now we will be dealing with 653. Subtract each of the digits six , five and three from nine and write them in the answer one by one ,

•  Nine minus six is 3. Nine minus five is 4. Nine minus three is 6 .

• The answer already obtained was 653 and now we suffix to it the digits 3 , 4 and 6. The complete answer is 653346

Also Check

Vedic maths trick : Squaring of numbers between 50 and 60

( Q ) Multiply 9994 by 9999

• 9094

X9099

-----------

=9993 0006

We subtract one from 9994 and write it as 9993. This becomes our left half of the answer . Next , we . , 447 x 900 subtract each of the digits of 9993 from 9 and write the answer as 0006. This becomes the right half of the answer . The complete answer is 99930006

(Q) Multiply 456789 by 999999

•  156789

x 99999

------------------

=456789 543211

We subtract 1 from 456789 and get the answer 456788. We write this down on the left hand side . Next , we subtract each of the digits of 456788 ( left hand side ) from 9 and get 543211 which becomes the right hand part of our answer . The complete answer is 456788543211

More examples :

•  7777

X 9999

----------

=77762223

•  65432

X99999

-----------

=6543134568

• 447

X999

----------

=446553

• 90909

X99999

-----------

=9090809091

The simplicity of this method can be vouched from the examples given above . Now we move toCase 2. In this case , we will multiply a given number with a higher number of nines .

Case 2

( Multiplying a number with a higher number of nines )

( Q ) Multiply 45 with 999

45             045X999=044955

X 999

--------

There are three nines in the multiplier . However , the multiplicand 45 has only two digits . So we add a zero and convert 45 to 045 and make it a three digit number . After having done so , we can carry on with the procedure explained in Case 1

. First we subtract 1 from 045 and write it down as 044. Next , we subtract each of the digits of 044 from 9 and write the answer as 955. The complete answer is 044955 ,

( Q ) Multiply 888 with 9999

888             0888X9999 = 8879112

X9999

We convert 888 to 0888 and make the digits equal to the number of nines in the multiplier . Next , we subtract 1 from 0888 and write the answer as 0887. Finally , we subtract each digit of 0887 from 9 and write the answer as 9112. The final answer is 08879112 which is 8879112

( Q ) Multiply  123 by 99999

123              00123 X99999 =

x 99999          00122 / 99877

The multiplicand is a three - digit number and the multiplier is a five - digit number . Therefore  we

Also Check

## Vedic maths trick :Squaring of numbers ending with ' 5

add two zeros in the multiplicand so that the digits are equal in the multiplicand and the multiplier .

We now subtract 1 from 00123 and write the left hand part of the answer as 00122. Next , we subtract each of the digits of the left hand part of the answer from 9 and write it down as 99877 as the right hand part of the answer . The complete answer is 12299877

Other examples :

•  162

X9999

-----------

0161/9838

•  5555

X99999

-----------

05554/94445

•  363

X999999

-------------

000362/999637

We can see that this technique is not only simple and easy to follow , but it also enables one to calculate the answer in the mind itself . This is the uniqueness of these systems . As you read the chapters of this book , you will realize how simple and easy it is to find the answer to virtually any problem of mathematics that one encounters in daily life and especially in the exams . And the approach is so different from the traditional methods of calculation that it makes the whole process enjoyable

Case 3 of this technique deals with multiplying a number with a lower number of nines . There is a separate technique for this in Vedic Mathematics and requires the knowledge of the Nikhilam Sutra ( explained later in this book ) . However , at this point of time , we can solve such problems using our normal practices of instant multiplication .

( Q ) Multiply 654 by 99 : In this case the number of digits are more than the number of nines in the multiplier . Instead of multiplying the number 654 with 99 we will multiply it with ( 100-1 ) . First we will multiply 654 with 100 and then we will subtract from it 654 multiplied by

1.

654

X 99

65400

-       654

--------------

= 64746

( Q ) Multiply 80020 by 999

We will multiply 80020 with ( 1000 - 1 ) .

80020000

-       800203

---------------

79939980

This method is so obvious that it needs no further elaboration .

## Friday, November 13, 2020

• November 13, 2020
• • , ,
• No comments

## Vedic maths trick : Squaring of numbers between 50 and 60 Topics,Facts,Quiz,more Maths topics

Squaring of numbers between 50 and 60

Hi friends and my dear students! In this post, I have covered Squaring of numbers between 50 and 60  After Reading  Please do share it with your friends. Learn maths for All classes here

Squaring of numbers between 50 and 60

57 x 57  =    ?

56 x 56  =    ?

52 x 52 =    ?

53 x 53 =    ?

We have taken four different examples above . We will be squaring the numbers 57 , 56 , 52 and 53 respectively . We can find the answer to the questions by taking two simple steps as given below :

( 1 ) Add 25 to the digit in the units place and put it as the left - hand part of the answer .

( 2 ) Square the digits in the units place and put it as the right - hand part of the answer . ( If it is a single digit then convert it to two digits )

( Q ) Find the square of 57

57

X 57

-------

32 49 .

In the first example we have to square 57. In this case we add 25 to the digit in the units place , viz . , 7. The answer is 32 which is the LHS ( left - hand side ) of our answer . ( Answer at this stage is 32_ )

• Next , we square the digit in the units place ‘ 7 ' and get the answer as 49. This 49 we put as the right hand part of our answer . The complete answer is 3249 .

( Q ) Find the square of 56

56

X 56

------

31 36

Also Check

## Vedic maths trick :Squaring of numbers ending with ' 5

In the second example , we add 25 to 6 and get the LHS as 31. Next , we square 6 and get the answer 36 which we put on the RHS . The complete answer is 3136 .

( Q ) Find the square of 52

52

x 52

------

27 04

In the third example , we add 2 to 25 and get the LHS as 27. Next , we square 2 and get the answer 4 which we will put on the RHS . However , the RHS should be a two - digit number . Hence , we convert 4 to a two - digit number and represent it as 04. The complete answer is 2704

( Q ) Find the square of 53

53

x 53

-------

28 09

In the last example , we add 3 to 25 and get the answer as 28. Next , we square 3 and get the answer as 9. As mentioned in rule B , the answer on the RHS should be converted to two digits . Thus , we represent the digit 9 as 09. The complete answer is 2809 .

On similar lines we have :

51=2601

522   = 2704

542   =2916

552    = 3025

582  = 3364

50 నుంచి 60 మధ్య సంఖ్యల యొక్క స్క్వారింగ్

57 x 57 =  ?

56 x 56 =  ?

52 x 52 =  ?

53 x 53 =  ?

పైన నాలుగు విభిన్న ఉదాహరణలను మనం తీసుకున్నాం. మనం వరసగా 57, 56, 52 మరియు 53 నెంబర్లను స్క్వారింగ్ చేస్తాం. దిగువ పేర్కొన్న రెండు సరళమైన దశలను తీసుకోవడం ద్వారా ప్రశ్నలకు మనం సమాధానం కనుగొనవచ్చు:

(1). 25 ని యూనిట్ స్థానంలో అంకెకు జోడించండి మరియు సమాధానం యొక్క ఎడమ - చేతి భాగం వలే ఉంచండి.

(2). అంకెలను యూనిట్ స్ప్లేస్ లో స్క్వేర్ చేయండి మరియు సమాధానం యొక్క కుడి - చేతి భాగంవలే ఉంచండి. ఒకవేళ అది సింగిల్ డిజిట్ అయితే దానిని రెండు అంకెలుగా మార్చండి.

Q) 57 యొక్క వర్గామును కనుగొనండి.

57

X 57

-------

32 49 .

మొదటి ఉదాహరణలో మనం 57 చతురస్రం చేయాల్సి ఉంటుంది. సందర్భంలో మనం 25 ని యూనిట్ స్ప్లేస్ లో అంకెకు జోడించాం. , 7. సమాధానం 32, ఇది మన సమాధానం యొక్క LHS (ఎడమ - చేతి వైపు) . దశలో సమాధానం 32_

తరువాత, మనం అంకెలను యూనిట్ ల్లో ' 7 ' వద్ద చతురస్రం చేస్తాం మరియు 49 వలే సమాధానం పొందండి. 49 ని మన సమాధానానికి కుడి చేతి భాగం గా ఉంచాము . పూర్తి సమాధానం 3249 .

Q)56 యొక్క వర్గామును కనుగొనండి.

56

X56

------

31 36

రెండో ఉదాహరణలో, మనం 25 నుంచి 6 ని జతచేస్తాం మరియు LHSని 31గా పొందుతాం. తరువాత మనం 6 చతురస్రం మరియు RHS పై మనం వేసే సమాధానం 36ని పొందుతాం. పూర్తి సమాధానం 3136 .

Q) 52 యొక్క వర్గామును కనుగొనండి.

52

X52

------

27 04

మూడో ఉదాహరణలో, మనం 2 నుంచి 25 ని జోడించాం మరియు LHSని 27గా పొందుతాం. తరువాత, మనం 2 చతురస్రం మరియు సమాధానం 4ని పొందుతాం, దీనిని మనం RHSపై ఉంచుతాం. అయితే, RHS అనేది రెండు - అంకెల సంఖ్యగా ఉండాలి. అందువల్ల, మనం 4ని రెండు - అంకెల సంఖ్యగా మారుస్తాం మరియు దానిని 04గా పేర్కొందాం. పూర్తి సమాధానం 2704

( Q ) Find the square of 53

53

x 53

-------

28 09

చివరి ఉదాహరణలో, మనం 3 నుంచి 25 ని జోడించాం మరియు 28 వలే సమాధానం పొందుతాం. తరువాత, మనం 3ని చతురస్రం చేస్తాం మరియు 9 వలే సమాధానం పొందుతాం. నియమం Bలో పేర్కొన్నవిధంగా, RHS పై ఉండే సమాధానాన్ని రెండు అంకెలుగా మార్చాలి. అందువల్ల, మనం 9 అనే అంకెను 09గా పేర్కొంతాము. పూర్తి సమాధానం 2809 .

On similar lines we have :

51=2601

522   = 2704

542   =2916

552    = 3025

582  = 3364

## Thursday, November 12, 2020

• November 12, 2020
• • , ,
• No comments

## Vedic maths trick :Squaring of numbers ending with ' 5 ',Topics,Facts,Quiz,more Maths topics

Squaring of numbers ending with ' 5 '

Hi friends and my dear students! In this post, I have covered Squaring of numbers ending with ' 5 ' ! After Reading  Please do share it with your friends. Learn maths for All classes here

Squaring is multiplying a number by itself . Let us have a look at how to square numbers ending in 5

( Q ) Find the square of 65

65

x 65

---------

42 25

In 65 , the number apart from 5 is 6 .

After 6 comes 7. So , we multiply 6 by 7 and write down the answer 42 .

Next , we multiply the last digits , viz . ( 5 x 5 ) and write down 25 to the right of 42 and complete our multiplication . Our answer is 4225 .

( Q ) Find the square of 75

75

x 73

--------

56 25

Apart from 5 the number is 7. The number that comes after 7 is 8. We multiply 7 with 8 and write the answer 56. Next , we multiply the last digits ( 5 x 5 ) and put 25 beside it and get our answer as 5625. Thus , ( 75 x 75 ) is 5625 .

( Q ) Find the square of 95

Apart from 5 the digit is 9. After 9 comes 10. When 9 is multiplied by 10 the answer is 90. Finally , we vertically multiply the right hand most digits ( 5 x 5 ) and write the answer 25 beside it . Thus , the square of 95 is 9025

(Q ) Find the square of 105

The previous  examples that we solved were of two - digits each . But the same technique can be extended to numbers of any length . In the current example , we will try to determine the square of a three - digit number - 105

. Apart from 5 the digits are 1 and 0 , that is , 10. After 10 comes 11. We multiply 10 with 11 and write the answer as 110. We suffix 25 to it and write the final answer as 11025. The square of 105 is 11025

So you can see how simple it is to square numbers ending with a five ! In fact , you can mentally calculate the square of a number ending with a 5. Just multiply the non - five numbers with the next number and then multiply the last digits ( 5 x 5 ) and add 25 after it .

## Free Vedic maths trick : How to predict a person's Date of Birth

A few more examples are given below :

152 = 225

252 = 625

35 = 1225

45 2= 2025

552 = 3025

852 = 7225

1152 = 13225 ( 11 x 12 = 132 )

2052 = 42025 ( 20 x 21 = 420 )

Thus we see that the technique holds true in all the examples .

The technique of squaring numbers ending with 5 is a very popular technique . Some educational boards have included it in their curriculum . In Vedic Mathematics , there is an extension to this principle which is not known to many people . This formula of Vedic Mathematics tells us that the above rule is applicable not only to the squaring of numbers ending in 5 but also to the multiplication of numbers whose last digits add to 10 and the remaining digits are the same .

Thus , there are two conditions necessary for this multiplication . The first condition is that the last digits should add to 10 and the second condition is that the remaining digits should be the same .

Let us have a look at a few examples :

107 x 103 =?    91x99 =  ?  51 x 59= ?

In the above examples , it can be observed that the last digits in each case add up to 10 and the remaining digits are the same . Let us take the first example ...

Here the last digits are 6 and 4 which add up to 10. Secondly , the remaining digits are the same , viz . ' 6 ' and ' 6 ' . Thus , we can find the square of this number by the same principle which we used in 66 x64

squaring numbers ending with a 5 .

First , multiply the number 6 by the number that follows it . After 6 comes 7. Thus , ( 6 x 7 ) is 42 .

Next , we multiply the right - hand most digits ( 6 x 4 ) and write the answer as 24. The complete answer is 4224 .

107

x 103

---------------

110 21

In the second example , we have to multiply 107 by 103. In this case the last digits 7 and 3 add to 10 and the remaining digits are the same . We will obtain the product using the same procedure .

First , we will multiply the number 10 by the number that follows it , 11 , and write the answer as 110

• Next , we multiply the right - hand most digits , viz . 7 and 3 , and write the answer as 21. The complete answer is 11021

In the third example , we have to multiply 91 by 99

91

x 99

--------

90 09

• We multiply 9 by the number that follows it , 10 , and write the answer as 90 .

• We multiply the numbers ( 1 * 9 ) and write the answer as 09. The final answer is 9009 .

( Note : The right hand part should always be filled - in with a two - digit number . Thus , we have to convert the number 9 to 09. )

In the last example , we have to multiply 51 by 59

51

X 59

-----------

3009

We multiply 5 with the next number 6 and write the answer as 30 .

Next , we multiply ( 1 x 9 ) and write the answer as 09. The final answer is 3009

This formula of Vedic Mathematics works for any such numbers whose last digits add up to ten and the remaining digits are the same . The same formula works while squaring numbers ending with 5 because when you square two numbers ending with 5 , then the right hand most digits add to 10 ( 5 plus 5 ) and the remaining digits are the same ( since we are squaring them ) .

Let us look at a few other examples where the right - hand most digits add to 10 and the remaining digits are the same .

72 x 78   = 5616

84 x 86= 7224

23 x 27=  621

89 x 81 = 7209

106 x 104   = 11024

1003 x 1007 = 1010021

This was the first specific technique that we studied . The next technique that we will discuss is also related to squaring . It is used to square numbers that lie between 50 and 60

*5తో ముగిసే సంఖ్యల యొక్క స్క్వారింగ్ :

ఒక సంఖ్యను తనద్వారా రెట్టింపు చేయడం అనేది. 5తో ముగిసే సంఖ్యలను ఎలా చతురస్రం చేయాలో మనం ఇప్పుడు చూద్దాం.

65 యొక్క చతురస్రాన్ని (వర్గామును) కనుగొనండి.

65

x 65

---------

42 25

65లో , 5 కాకుండా సంఖ్య 6 .

6 తరువాత 7 వస్తుంది. అంటే, మనం 6ని 7తో గుణించి, సమాధానం 42 ని రాయండి.తరువాత, మనం చివరి అంకెలను గుణిస్తాం, అవి.( 5 x 5 ) మరియు 42 యొక్క కుడివైపున 25 రాయండి మరియు మన గుణకారాన్ని పూర్తి చేయండి. మా సమాధానం 4225 .

75 యొక్క చతురస్రాన్ని(వర్గాము)  కనుగొనండి.

75

x 73

--------

56 25

5 కాకుండా 7. 7 తరువాత వచ్చే సంఖ్య 8. మనం 7ని 8తో గుణించి, 56 సమాధానం రాయండి. తరువాత, మనం చివరి అంకెలను గుణిస్తాం( 5 * 5) మరియు దాని పక్కన 25 ఉంచి, 5625 వలే మా సమాధానం పొందండి. అంటే , ( 75 x 75 ) 5625.

95 యొక్క చతురస్రాన్ని(వర్గాము)  కనుగొనండి.

5 కాకుండా అంకె 9. 9 తరువాత 10 వస్తుంది. 9ని 10తో గుణించినప్పుడు సమాధానం 90. చివరగా, మనం కుడిచేతిలో అత్యధిక అంకెలను నిట్టనిలువుగా గుణించి, దాని పక్కన 25 అనే సమాధానాన్ని రాయండి. అంటే, 95 యొక్క చతురస్రం 9025.

Q ) 105 యొక్క చతురస్రాన్ని(వర్గాము)  కనుగొనండి

మనం పరిష్కరించిన గత ఉదాహరణలు ప్రతి దానికి రెండు - అంకెలు. అయితే ఇదే పద్ధతిని పొడవుకు చెందిన సంఖ్యలకు అయినా పొడిగించవచ్చు. ప్రస్తుత ఉదాహరణలో, మనం మూడు అంకెల సంఖ్య - 105 యొక్క చతురస్రాన్ని తెలుసుకోవడానికి ప్రయత్నిస్తాం.

. 5 అంకెలు కాకుండా 1 మరియు 0, అంటే 10. 10 తరువాత 11 వస్తుంది. 10ని 11తో గుణించి, సమాధానాన్ని 110గా రాయండి. 25 కు ప్రత్యయం మరియు తుది సమాధానాన్ని 11025 గా రాయండి. 105 యొక్క చతురస్రం 11025

అంటే ఒక ఐదు తో ముగిసే సంఖ్యలను చతురస్రం చేయడం ఎంత సులభమని మీరు చూడవచ్చు ! నిజానికి, మీరు ఒక 5తో ముగిసే ఒక సంఖ్య యొక్క చతురస్రాన్ని మానసికంగా లెక్కించవచ్చు. తరువాత సంఖ్యతో ఐదు సంఖ్యలను గుణించి, తరువాత చివరి అంకెలను గుణించి , (5 x 5) మరియు దాని తరువాత 25 ని జోడించండి.

మరికొన్ని ఉదాహరణలు క్రింద ఇవ్వబడ్డాయి:

152 = 225

252 = 625

35 = 1225

45 2= 2025

552 = 3025

852 = 7225

1152 = 13225 ( 11 x 12 = 132 )

2052 = 42025 ( 20 x 21 = 420 )

విధంగా అన్ని ఉదాహరణలలో పద్ధతి సత్యమని మనం చూస్తాం.5తో ముగిసే సంఖ్యలను స్క్వార్డింగ్ చేసే టెక్నిక్ చాలా ప్రాచుర్యం పొందిన టెక్నిక్. కొన్ని విద్యా బోర్డులు దీనిని తమ పాఠ్యప్రణాళికలో చేర్చాయి. వైదిక గణితంలో, సూత్రానికి పొడిగింపు ఉంది, ఇది చాలామందికి తెలియదు. వైదిక గణిత సూత్రం ప్రకారం పై నియమం 5తో ముగిసే సంఖ్యల యొక్క స్క్వారింగ్ కు మాత్రమే కాకుండా, చివరి అంకెలు 10కి జోడించబడ్డ సంఖ్యల యొక్క గుణకారానికి కూడా వర్తిస్తుంది మరియు మిగిలిన అంకెలు ఒకేవిధంగా ఉంటాయని తెలియజేస్తుంది.

అందువలన, గుణకారానికి రెండు షరతులు అవసరం. మొదటి షరతు ఏమిటంటే చివరి అంకెలు 10కి జోడించాలి మరియు మిగిలిన అంకెలు ఒకేవిధంగా ఉండాలనేది రెండో కండిషన్.

కొన్ని ఉదాహరణలను మనం ఇప్పుడు చూద్దాం.

107 x 103 =?    91 x9 9 = ?  51 x 59= ?

పై ఉదాహరణల్లో, ప్రతి సందర్భంలోని చివరి అంకెలు 10 వరకు జోడించబడి, మిగిలిన అంకెలు ఒకేవిధంగా ఉండటాన్ని గమనించవచ్చు. మొదటి ఉదాహరణ చూద్దాం ...

ఇక్కడ చివరి అంకెలు 6 మరియు 4, ఇవి 10 వరకు జోడించబడతాయి. రెండోది, మిగిలిన అంకెలు ఒకేవిధంగా ఉంటాయి. ' 6 ' మరియు ' 6 ' . 66 x64 లో మనం ఉపయోగించిన అదే సూత్రం ద్వారా సంఖ్య యొక్క చతురస్రాన్ని మనం కనుగొనవచ్చు.

a 5తో ముగిసే సంఖ్యలు .

తరువాత వచ్చే సంఖ్యతో 6 సంఖ్యను గుణించండి. 6 తరువాత 7 వస్తుంది. అంటే , ( 6 x 7 ) 42.

తరువాత, మనం కుడిచేతి వైపు అంకెలను గుణిస్తాం మరియు 6 x 4 అంకెలను 24గా రాయండి. పూర్తి సమాధానం 4224 .

107

x 103

---------------

110 21

రెండో ఉదాహరణలో, మనం 107ని 103తో గుణించాల్సి ఉంటుంది. సందర్భంలో చివరి అంకెలు 7 మరియు 3 లను 10కు జోడించండి మరియు మిగిలిన అంకెలు ఒకేవిధంగా ఉంటాయి. అదే ప్రక్రియను ఉపయోగించి మనం ప్రొడక్ట్ ని పొందుతాం.

• మొదట, 10 అనే సంఖ్యను, దాని తరువాత వచ్చే సంఖ్యతో గుణించి, 11, మరియు సమాధానాన్ని 110గా రాయండి.తరువాత , మనం కుడిచేతివైపు అత్యధిక అంకెలను గుణిస్తాం, అవి. 7 మరియు 3 మరియు సమాధానం 21 గా రాయండి. పూర్తి సమాధానం 11021

మూడో ఉదాహరణలో 91ని 99తో గుణించాల్సి ఉంటుంది.

91

x 99

--------

90 09

10, తరువాత వచ్చే సంఖ్యతో మనం 9ని గుణిస్తాం మరియు సమాధానాన్ని 90గా రాయండి.

మనం 1X 9 అనే సంఖ్యలను గుణిస్తాం మరియు సమాధానాన్ని 09 గా రాయండి. తుది సమాధానం 9009 .

గమనిక: కుడిచేతి భాగాన్ని ఎల్లప్పుడూ రెండు - అంకెల సంఖ్యతో నింపాలి. అందువల్ల, మనం 9 అనే నెంబరును 09కు మార్చాల్సి ఉంటుంది. )

చివరి ఉదాహరణలో, మనం 51ని 59తో గుణించాల్సి ఉంటుంది.

51

x   59

-----------

3009

మనం 5ని తరువాత సంఖ్య 6తో గుణించి, సమాధానాన్ని 30గా రాయండి.

తరువాత , మనం 1 x 9ని గుణించి, సమాధానాన్ని 09గా రాయండి. తుది సమాధానం 3009

వైదిక గణిత సూత్రం అటువంటి సంఖ్యలకు పనిచేస్తుంది, దీని యొక్క చివరి అంకెలు పది వరకు జోడించబడతాయి మరియు మిగిలిన అంకెలు ఒకేవిధంగా ఉంటాయి. 5తో ముగిసే సంఖ్యలను స్క్వారింగ్ చేసేటప్పుడు అదే సూత్రం పనిచేస్తుంది, ఎందుకంటే మీరు రెండు అంకెలను 5తో ముగిస్తే, కుడి చేతి అంకెలు 10 (5 x 5)కు జోడించబడతాయి మరియు మిగిలిన అంకెలు కూడా ఒకేవిధంగా ఉంటాయి( మనం వాటిని స్క్వాపింగ్ చేస్తున్నాం కనుక)

కుడి - చేతి అంకెలు 10మరియు మిగిలిన అంకెలు ఒకేవిధంగా ఉండే కొన్ని ఉదాహరణలను మనం ఇప్పుడు చూద్దాం.

72 x 78 =5616

84 x 86 = 7224

23 x 27 = 621

89 x 81 = 7209

106 x 104= 11024

1003 x 1007 = 1010021

ఇది మేము అధ్యయనం చేసిన మొదటి నిర్దిష్ట టెక్నిక్ . మనం చర్చించబోయే తదుపరి టెక్నిక్ కూడా స్క్వరింగ్ కు సంబంధించినది. 50 నుంచి 60 మధ్య ఉండే సంఖ్యలను చతురస్రం చేయడానికి దీనిని ఉపయోగిస్తారు.