Showing posts with label Squaring of numbers between 50 and 60. Show all posts
Showing posts with label Squaring of numbers between 50 and 60. Show all posts

## Friday, November 13, 2020

• November 13, 2020

## Vedic maths trick : Squaring of numbers between 50 and 60 Topics,Facts,Quiz,more Maths topics

Squaring of numbers between 50 and 60

Hi friends and my dear students! In this post, I have covered Squaring of numbers between 50 and 60  After Reading  Please do share it with your friends. Learn maths for All classes here

Squaring of numbers between 50 and 60

57 x 57  =    ?

56 x 56  =    ?

52 x 52 =    ?

53 x 53 =    ?

We have taken four different examples above . We will be squaring the numbers 57 , 56 , 52 and 53 respectively . We can find the answer to the questions by taking two simple steps as given below :

( 1 ) Add 25 to the digit in the units place and put it as the left - hand part of the answer .

( 2 ) Square the digits in the units place and put it as the right - hand part of the answer . ( If it is a single digit then convert it to two digits )

( Q ) Find the square of 57

57

X 57

-------

32 49 .

In the first example we have to square 57. In this case we add 25 to the digit in the units place , viz . , 7. The answer is 32 which is the LHS ( left - hand side ) of our answer . ( Answer at this stage is 32_ )

• Next , we square the digit in the units place ‘ 7 ' and get the answer as 49. This 49 we put as the right hand part of our answer . The complete answer is 3249 .

( Q ) Find the square of 56

56

X 56

------

31 36

Also Check

## Vedic maths trick :Squaring of numbers ending with ' 5

In the second example , we add 25 to 6 and get the LHS as 31. Next , we square 6 and get the answer 36 which we put on the RHS . The complete answer is 3136 .

( Q ) Find the square of 52

52

x 52

------

27 04

In the third example , we add 2 to 25 and get the LHS as 27. Next , we square 2 and get the answer 4 which we will put on the RHS . However , the RHS should be a two - digit number . Hence , we convert 4 to a two - digit number and represent it as 04. The complete answer is 2704

( Q ) Find the square of 53

53

x 53

-------

28 09

In the last example , we add 3 to 25 and get the answer as 28. Next , we square 3 and get the answer as 9. As mentioned in rule B , the answer on the RHS should be converted to two digits . Thus , we represent the digit 9 as 09. The complete answer is 2809 .

On similar lines we have :

51=2601

522   = 2704

542   =2916

552    = 3025

582  = 3364

50 నుంచి 60 మధ్య సంఖ్యల యొక్క స్క్వారింగ్

57 x 57 =  ?

56 x 56 =  ?

52 x 52 =  ?

53 x 53 =  ?

పైన నాలుగు విభిన్న ఉదాహరణలను మనం తీసుకున్నాం. మనం వరసగా 57, 56, 52 మరియు 53 నెంబర్లను స్క్వారింగ్ చేస్తాం. దిగువ పేర్కొన్న రెండు సరళమైన దశలను తీసుకోవడం ద్వారా ప్రశ్నలకు మనం సమాధానం కనుగొనవచ్చు:

(1). 25 ని యూనిట్ స్థానంలో అంకెకు జోడించండి మరియు సమాధానం యొక్క ఎడమ - చేతి భాగం వలే ఉంచండి.

(2). అంకెలను యూనిట్ స్ప్లేస్ లో స్క్వేర్ చేయండి మరియు సమాధానం యొక్క కుడి - చేతి భాగంవలే ఉంచండి. ఒకవేళ అది సింగిల్ డిజిట్ అయితే దానిని రెండు అంకెలుగా మార్చండి.

Q) 57 యొక్క వర్గామును కనుగొనండి.

57

X 57

-------

32 49 .

మొదటి ఉదాహరణలో మనం 57 చతురస్రం చేయాల్సి ఉంటుంది. సందర్భంలో మనం 25 ని యూనిట్ స్ప్లేస్ లో అంకెకు జోడించాం. , 7. సమాధానం 32, ఇది మన సమాధానం యొక్క LHS (ఎడమ - చేతి వైపు) . దశలో సమాధానం 32_

తరువాత, మనం అంకెలను యూనిట్ ల్లో ' 7 ' వద్ద చతురస్రం చేస్తాం మరియు 49 వలే సమాధానం పొందండి. 49 ని మన సమాధానానికి కుడి చేతి భాగం గా ఉంచాము . పూర్తి సమాధానం 3249 .

Q)56 యొక్క వర్గామును కనుగొనండి.

56

X56

------

31 36

రెండో ఉదాహరణలో, మనం 25 నుంచి 6 ని జతచేస్తాం మరియు LHSని 31గా పొందుతాం. తరువాత మనం 6 చతురస్రం మరియు RHS పై మనం వేసే సమాధానం 36ని పొందుతాం. పూర్తి సమాధానం 3136 .

Q) 52 యొక్క వర్గామును కనుగొనండి.

52

X52

------

27 04

మూడో ఉదాహరణలో, మనం 2 నుంచి 25 ని జోడించాం మరియు LHSని 27గా పొందుతాం. తరువాత, మనం 2 చతురస్రం మరియు సమాధానం 4ని పొందుతాం, దీనిని మనం RHSపై ఉంచుతాం. అయితే, RHS అనేది రెండు - అంకెల సంఖ్యగా ఉండాలి. అందువల్ల, మనం 4ని రెండు - అంకెల సంఖ్యగా మారుస్తాం మరియు దానిని 04గా పేర్కొందాం. పూర్తి సమాధానం 2704

( Q ) Find the square of 53

53

x 53

-------

28 09

చివరి ఉదాహరణలో, మనం 3 నుంచి 25 ని జోడించాం మరియు 28 వలే సమాధానం పొందుతాం. తరువాత, మనం 3ని చతురస్రం చేస్తాం మరియు 9 వలే సమాధానం పొందుతాం. నియమం Bలో పేర్కొన్నవిధంగా, RHS పై ఉండే సమాధానాన్ని రెండు అంకెలుగా మార్చాలి. అందువల్ల, మనం 9 అనే అంకెను 09గా పేర్కొంతాము. పూర్తి సమాధానం 2809 .

On similar lines we have :

51=2601

522   = 2704

542   =2916

552    = 3025

582  = 3364